IL HR0766 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Opposes any state taxes based on the number of miles driven.
Title
NO PER MILE DRIVING TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-09-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2018-09-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-09-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-09-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Helene Miller Walsh |
2018-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=766&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0766.htm |