IL HR0766 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Opposes any state taxes based on the number of miles driven.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NO PER MILE DRIVING TAX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback