IL HR0766 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Opposes any state taxes based on the number of miles driven.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NO PER MILE DRIVING TAX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-09-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Helene Miller Walsh
2018-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-09-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-01-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback