IL HR0764 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Illinois State Board of Education to send a list of all non-public schools that have been recognized as Invest in Kids Act qualified schools for the 2017-2018 school year, and all schools that could be recognized as qualified schools before the 2018-2019 school year to the Illinois Department of Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INVEST IN KIDS ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseTo Scholarship Tax Credit Oversight Subcommittee
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback