IL HR0762 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Congress of the United States to pass, and the President to sign, legislation removing 42 U.S.C. 300aa-22(b)(1) from law and allowing design defect claims against vaccine manufacturers by individuals who have experienced adverse side effects caused by vaccines.
Title
FEDS-VACCINE LAWSUITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-003-001 |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-26 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=762&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0762.htm |