IL HR0759 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges all citizens to visit "cancerscreenweek.org" for cancer screening resources and talk to their healthcare providers about their risk factors for all cancer types including, but not limited to, breast, cervical, colon, lung, prostate, and skin cancers and recommended screening options. Declares the first week of December of 2018 as "Cancer Screen Week".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANCER SCREEN WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-22HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback