IL HR0756 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares June 27, 2018 as "Illinois Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day". Declares June of 2018 as "Illinois Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month". Urges the Department of Public Health and the Department of Veterans' Affairs to continue working to educate victims of abuse, crime, and natural disasters, and service members, veterans and their families, and the general public, about the causes, symptoms, and treatment of post-traumatic stress injury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PTSI AWARENESS DAY/MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-19HouseRecommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback