IL HR0755 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Strongly urges the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to delay the implementation of the Health Choice Illinois Medicaid Managed Care Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DELAY MEDICAID HLTH CHOICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-01-31HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-003-000
2018-01-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-01-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-01-18HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback