IL HR0754 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 11-15, 2022 as Prescribed Burning Awareness Week. Supports the appropriate and continued use of prescribed fire in Illinois.
Title
PRESCRIBED BURNING WEEK
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] |
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
Rep. Mark Luft [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-04-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-04-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-03-29 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=754&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0754.htm |