IL HR0742 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the owners of the Chicago Bears to move the team to Arlington Park. States the Chicago Bears organization should move to the Arlington Heights location without requesting incentives from local or state government that would go toward stadium construction.
Title
CHICAGO BEARS-MOVE LOCATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-03-28 | House | Assigned to Tourism Committee |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=742&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0742.htm |