IL HR0741 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reaffirms Illinois's commitment to the strengthening and deepening of the sister-state relationship between Taiwan and the State of Illinois and supports Taiwan's efforts to be included in free trade agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TAIWAN - FREE TRADE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseRecommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback