IL HR0735 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Congress of the United States to enact legislation that would require the manufacturers of replica guns to design them to be clearly distinguishable from real firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPLICA GUNS-REGULATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback