IL HR0731 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Congress of the United States of America to enact permanent Daylight Saving Time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DAYLIGHT SAVING TIME

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-12-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback