IL HR0726 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 104-000-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Director of Public Health, the Director of Veterans' Affairs, and Governor Rauner's administration to provide a comprehensive report to the General Assembly that includes detailed timelines of what information the Illinois Veteran's Home at Quincy, the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs, the Illinois Department of Public Health, and Governor Rauner's administration knew, and when they knew it, with regards to the Legionnaires' disease outbreak at the Illinois Veteran's Home at Quincy. This report should also include a detailed proposal on how to contain the spread of, and end the outbreaks of, Legionnaires' disease at the Illinois Veteran's Home at Quincy in the future.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RPT ON LEGIONNAIRES' DISEASE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseResolution Adopted as Amended 104-000-001
2018-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-02-14HouseRecommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-01-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-01-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-01-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-01-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-12-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-12-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-12-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-12-20HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-12-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-12-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-12-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-12-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback