IL HR0718 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Illinois Department of Healthcare and Family Services to include certain measures in its upcoming Medicaid Managed Care Organization Request for Proposal (RFP) to ensure a robust, equitable, and inclusive procurement process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-MMCO REQUEST FOR PROPOSAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-23HouseResolution Adopted
2024-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2024-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2024-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2024-05-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2024-05-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
2024-05-15HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
2024-04-24HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2024-04-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-04-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback