IL HR0713 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the President and Congress of the United States to reauthorize the Older Americans Act and restore funding to Fiscal Year 2010 levels adjusted for inflation.
Title
REAUTHORIZE OLDER AMERICAN ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=713&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0713.htm |