IL HR0711 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares a Mental Healthcare Emergency in Illinois and urges the consideration of a comprehensive legislative package to address the community mental health and substance disorder workforce and behavioral healthcare access crisis in Illinois by the end of the 100th General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MENTAL HEALTHCARE EMERGENCY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 017-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-12-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-12-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-12-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-12-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-12-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-12-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-12-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-12-04HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback