IL HR0710 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes "Eating Disorders Awareness Week" as commencing the last Sunday in February.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EATING DISORDER AWARENESS WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseResolution Adopted
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-13HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-12-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-12-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback