IL HR0703 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the adoption and utilization of XBRL by all Illinois municipalities and state agencies in their financial reporting to increase transparency, decrease costs, and more easily permit comparison of financial data. Encourages the Office of the Comptroller and the Department of Innovation and Technology to investigate the feasibility of the development of an official XBRL taxonomy for use by Illinois municipalities and state agencies and to make adoption of XBRL by those entities easier and ensure comparability.
Title
XBRL-SUPPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=703&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0703.htm |