IL HR0694 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supports United States Secretary of Energy Rick Perry's directive that replaces the distorted pricing rules but preserves and supports competitive markets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENERGY PRICING RULES-SEC PERRY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Energy Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-11-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback