IL HR0684 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the month of June 2022 as Caribbean-American Heritage Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
CARIBBEAN-AMERICAN HERITAGE MO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-03-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=684&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0684.htm |