IL HR0682 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Condemns voter suppression efforts and supports all efforts to protect the free exercise of the right to vote.
Title
CONDEMN VOTER SUPPRESSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-02-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=682&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0682.htm |