IL HR0680 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States that Illinois can meet the needs of Amazon's second headquarters in North America and looks forward to offering a warm welcome if they so choose Illinois as home for HQ2
Title
WELCOME AMAZON HQ2
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=680&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0680.htm |