IL HR0672 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-07 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Opposes any and all efforts by the Trump Administration and Congress to eliminate the state and local tax deduction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SALT-NO ELIMINATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-07HouseResolution Adopted as Amended
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-11-07HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000
2017-11-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-11-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-11-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2017-11-01HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-11-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback