IL HR0662 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares November of 2017 as "Diabetes and Heart Disease Awareness Month" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DIABETES/HEART DISEASE MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-08HouseResolution Adopted
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-11-08HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-11-07HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-11-07HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-11-02HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-11-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback