IL HR0651 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Resolution Adopted 101-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Resolution Adopted 101-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports (1) the investigation and consideration of new advanced transmission technologies that offer revolutionary performance benefits when replacing aged transmission infrastructure; (2) the evaluation of new advanced transmission technologies to determine whether they are best able to cost-effectively ensure the continued reliable delivery of electricity while providing revolutionary greater capacity and revolutionary enhanced efficiency on schedules required to meet the state's public policy objectives; (3) the consideration of the ability of these technologies to greatly reduce environmental and visual impacts to communities; and (4) the consideration of the ability of these and other technologies to greatly reduce the overall cost of energy delivery.
Title
ELECTRICAL GRID-IMPROVEMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Resolution Adopted 101-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Energy Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |