IL HR0648 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reconstitutes the Firearm Public Awareness Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM AWARENESS TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - Motion in House (Y: 88 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-28HouseResolution Adopted as Amended 088-024-000
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-02-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-11-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-11-06HouseRecommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-000-000
2017-10-24HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-10-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback