IL HR0647 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the 100th anniversary of Pease's Candy.
Title
RECOGNIZE-PEASE'S CANDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Tabled |
2018-01-31 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2018-01-30 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2017-10-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=647&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0647.htm |