IL HR0643 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the month of March 2024 as Cerebral Palsy Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CEREBRAL PALSY AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
2024-05-24HouseResolution Adopted
2024-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2024-05-02HouseRecommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
2024-03-20HouseAssigned to Public Health Committee
2024-03-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-03-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nicole La Ha

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback