IL HR0642 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mourns the passing of Wayne County Sheriff's Deputy Sean Riley.
Title
MEMORIAL-DEPUTY SEAN RILEY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=642&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0642.htm |