IL HR0636 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Stands in opposition to the United States Department of Labor's permanent closure of the Job Corps Civilian Conservation Center in Golconda, and states support for the future retainment, or creation of, job training centers in the State of Illinois.
Title
GOLCONDA JOB CENTER-RETAIN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=636&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0636.htm |