IL HR0632 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to reauthorize the Violence Against Women Act.
Title
VIOLENCE AGAINST WOMEN ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-01-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-01-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-01-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-01-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-01-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-01-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-12-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-12-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-12-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-12-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-12-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-12-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-12-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=632&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0632.htm |