IL HR0607 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requests Mental Health Committee formulate a plan to help improve parity and remove barriers to mental health and addiction coverage by the end of the 100th General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ACCESS TO MENTAL HEALTH CARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-08HouseResolution Adopted
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-10-26HouseRecommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 016-000-000
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2017-10-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-09-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-09-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-09-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-09-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-09-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-09-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback