IL HR0591 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-24 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulates Elaine Nekritz on her retirement as State Representative for the 57th Legislative District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONGRATS - REP. ELAINE NEKRITZ

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-24HouseResolution Adopted
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar Agreed Resolutions
2017-10-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-10-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-10-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-10-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-10-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-10-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-08-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback