IL HR0590 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes September as Suicide Prevention Awareness Month.
Title
RECOGNIZE - SUICIDE PREVENTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-10-26 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-10-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-10-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=590&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0590.htm |