IL HR0584 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares February 29, 2024 as Superman Day.
Title
SUPERMAN DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-02 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 016-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=584&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0584.htm |