IL HR0577 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Condemns President Donald J. Trump's Migrant Protection Protocols denying entry to refugees at the Southern border and calls on him to immediately rescind this abhorrent policy that is placing vulnerable people at further risk of harm, and calls on the U.S. Congress to put an end to the Migrant Protection Protocols by defunding the program in its upcoming budget vote before the end of this calendar year.
Title
MIGRANT PROTOCOLS-CONDEMN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-11-14 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-11-13 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-11-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-11-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-11-06 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-10-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |