IL HR0570 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Denounces the violent terrorism, extreme rhetoric, and bigoted ideologies that are being promoted. Urges law enforcement to recognize this violence as domestic terrorism, and to pursue the criminal elements of these domestic terrorists in the same manner and with the same fervor used to protect the United States from other manifestations of terrorism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DENOUNCE DOMESTIC TERRORISM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-08-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-08-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback