IL HR0570 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Denounces the violent terrorism, extreme rhetoric, and bigoted ideologies that are being promoted. Urges law enforcement to recognize this violence as domestic terrorism, and to pursue the criminal elements of these domestic terrorists in the same manner and with the same fervor used to protect the United States from other manifestations of terrorism.
Title
DENOUNCE DOMESTIC TERRORISM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=570&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0570.htm |