IL HR0569 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Inspector General of the City of Chicago to conduct a performance audit of the Chicago Police Department to determine and assess police emergency response times in Chicago neighborhoods and communities and to make recommendations to improve response times in primarily African American and Hispanic neighborhoods and communities.
Title
CHICAGO POLICE-RESPONSE TIME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-07-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-07-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-07-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-07-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-07-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-001-000 |
2015-07-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-05-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=569&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0569.htm |