IL HR0567 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Opposes the Cook County sweetened-beverage tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COOK COUNTY SUGAR TAX - REPEAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2017-08-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-08-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-08-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-08-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-08-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-08-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-08-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-08-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-08-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-08-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-08-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback