IL HR0558 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the Comptroller to suspend implementation of the accrual basis of accounting requirement pending the receipt of the Attorney General's opinion.
Title
LOCAL GOV. AUDIT REPORTS
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-07-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=558&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0558.htm |