IL HR0550 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Education Secretary Betsy DeVos to keep the Obama-era guidelines on sexual assault in place.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CAMPUS SEX ASSAULT GUIDELINES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-10-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-09-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-08-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-08-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-08-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-08-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-08-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-08-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-07-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-07-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-07-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-07-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-07-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-07-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-07-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-07-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback