IL HR0550 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Education Secretary Betsy DeVos to keep the Obama-era guidelines on sexual assault in place.
Title
CAMPUS SEX ASSAULT GUIDELINES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-09-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-08-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-08-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-08-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-08-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-07-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-07-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-07-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-07-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-07-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-07-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-07-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-07-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=550&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0550.htm |