IL HR0544 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to move our tax dollars in exactly the opposite direction proposed by the President, from militarism to human and environmental needs.
Title
FED TAX DOLLARS - MILITARY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-10-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-005-000 |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=544&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0544.htm |