IL HR0533 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges members of the General Assembly and the Governor to continue working on cutting waste and streamlining State government.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT - STREAMLINE
Sponsors
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-10-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-07-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-07-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-07-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-07-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-07-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=533&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0533.htm |