IL HR0533 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges members of the General Assembly and the Governor to continue working on cutting waste and streamlining State government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT - STREAMLINE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-10-26HouseRecommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-08-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-07-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-07-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-07-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-07-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-07-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback