IL HR0530 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Illinois communities to become involved in the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Foundation's "Wall of Faces" project to help locate pictures of soldiers whose photos were lost.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIETNAM - WALL OF FACES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-08HouseResolution Adopted as Amended
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris
2017-11-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-10-26HouseRecommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 007-000-000
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2017-08-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-07-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback