IL HR0527 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on September 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to promptly ratify the United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement.
Title
USMCA-RATIFY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-10-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-10-28 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-10-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-10-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-10-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-10-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-10-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-10-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-10-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-09-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-09-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-09-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-09-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-09-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=527&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0527.htm |