IL HR0527 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Resolution Adopted 109-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Instructs the House of Representatives Revenue & Finance Committee to conduct an investigation into ways to improve property tax assessment practices across the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TAX ASSESSMENT PRACTICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-08HouseResolution Adopted 109-000-000
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-10-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-10-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-07-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-06-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback